judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

ALAN R. LEWINE V. NANNE DAVIS ELIOT

Case Information: 10-FM-1613
Short Caption:ALAN R. LEWINE V. NANNE DAVIS ELIOTClassification:Appeals - Family - Support
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DRB721-03Filed Date:12/20/2010

Opening Event Date:12/20/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:01/26/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/09/2011

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantAlan R. Lewine N
Robert J. GoldmanYN
AppelleeNanne Davis EliotNPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/20/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/11/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal filed in this case on December 20, 2010, it is ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the attached statement regarding transcript. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. If partial transcripts are being ordered, appellant must file a statement of issues to be raised on appeal with this court within 10 days from the date of this order. See D.C. App. R. 10 (b)(3)(A). It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (JAC)
01/14/2011FiledSUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1 (68-pgs/tape 11/9/10 proc.)w/cd
01/19/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) 11/9/10 (rt. needed)
01/26/2011RECORD INDEX
01/26/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (a)(1), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (JAC)
03/14/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
03/14/2011APPENDIX
04/12/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO DISMISS/WITHDRAW APPEAL w/ attached a motion to withdraw as counsel filed in superior court filed by aple (Eliot)
04/18/2011TMC - appellee's motion to dismiss - oppo
04/22/2011APPELLANT'S OPPOSITION to Appellee's Motion to Dismiss and Stay Appellee's Response Pending Resolution of this Motion.
07/18/2011FiledDismissed
08/09/2011FiledMandate