judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JACK ELSWORTH FAUBION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0077)
Parent: S-09-0076 Case Docketed On:04/14/2009
Consolidated:S-09-0077
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:JACK ELSWORTH FAUBION v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JACK ELSWORTH FAUBION, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJack Elsworth FaubionDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2010 WY 79
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/14/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/14/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/01/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
05/26/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/27/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file brief.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/08/2009Motion - ConsolidateMotionConsolidateFinal
07/09/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to consolidate cases for briefing and argumentEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/09/2009Order - Consolidating casesOrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/16/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
07/16/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
08/21/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
08/24/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/02/2009Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
09/03/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
09/03/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
09/11/2009Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
09/11/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six total volumes. Volumes I-II, Original papers; Volumes III-IV, Confidential Folders; Volume V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
09/11/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/17/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
09/21/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
09/23/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/22/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina N. Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
10/22/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/18/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court, Chief Justice Voigt filed a specially concurring opinionOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/07/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/07/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/07/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
07/09/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 7/8/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal