judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00612-CR
05-94-00612-CR
04/15/1994
Robbery
Hall, William
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/30/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
06/30/1994Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsCase Transferred to Another Court of Appeals
04/29/1994Transcript Filed
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/31/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/24/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/27/1993Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 1
Dallas
Honorable Janice L. Warder
F93-00028-IH
10 yrs TDC