judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 13-94-00185-CR
13-94-00185-CR
04/15/1994
Sexual Assault
Navarro, III, Jesse
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/24/1997Record returned
05/21/1997Green card in
05/15/1997Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/15/1997Order Entered
05/08/1997additional copy of motion to withdraw
05/05/1997Motion to Withdraw ____________ Filed
09/27/1995Mandate Recd Ct Crim App / Dt. Clk
09/20/1995Mandate Issued
08/03/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
07/31/1995Submitted
07/31/1995Submission
07/10/1995Submission
06/29/1995Brief Filed
06/29/1995No oral argument requested
06/09/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/25/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/19/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/02/1995Brief Filed
05/02/1995Case ready to be set
05/02/1995No oral argument requested
04/26/1995Green card in
04/13/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/13/1995Order Entered
03/29/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/12/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/12/1995Motion to Substitute Counsel DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/29/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/29/1994Motion to Substitute Counsel
12/08/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/29/1994Green card in
11/28/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/23/199410 day letter sent
11/10/1994Motion for leave to file SOF DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
10/25/1994Motion for leave to file Statement of Facts
10/21/1994Statement of Facts Filed
10/21/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/21/1994Statement of Facts Received
10/07/1994Statement of Facts Filed
10/07/1994Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
09/15/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/31/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
07/28/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1994Motion for extension of time to file statement
07/13/1994Letter sent
07/11/1994Green card in
07/11/1994Letter filed
07/06/199410 day letter sent
05/06/1994Supplemental transcript filed
05/04/1994Letter sent
04/22/1994Transcript Filed
04/18/1994Certified Copy Filed
04/15/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Navarro, III, JesseAppellantThomas H. Morris, Iii
The State of TexasCriminal - State of TexasFrank Follis
Hon. Tommy L. Skaggs

Trial Court Information
25th District Court
Gonzales
Honorable Dwight E. Peschel
148-93
Life