judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00618-CR
05-94-00618-CR
04/15/1994
Sale/Delivery of Cocaine
Deadmon, Argus Sebastian
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/31/1997Case Returned from Higher Ct.
01/31/1997Motion to Withdraw Record
10/08/1995Mandate due to be issued
10/06/1995Case stored
10/06/1995Mandate Issued
10/06/1995Mandate Issued
08/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/21/1995Submission
02/21/1995Submitted
02/21/1995Submission
02/21/1995Submitted
01/11/1995MattConv
10/20/1994Brief Filed
10/20/1994Case ready to be set
10/20/1994Case ready to be set
08/17/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/29/1994Brief Filed
06/27/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/27/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/22/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/13/1994MattConv
06/13/1994Statement of Facts Filed
05/19/1994Transcript Filed
05/19/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/23/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
03/23/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/06/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
204th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable g Andrews
F93-64350-RQ
27 yrs TDC