judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00619-CR
05-94-00619-CR
04/15/1994
Sale/Delivery of Cocaine
Brown, Brandon Eric
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/05/1997Mandate Issued
05/05/1997Mandate Issued
02/10/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
02/10/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/10/1997Opinion WithdrawnWithdrawn
02/10/1997Order EnteredVacated
02/10/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/30/1996Motion for Rehearing Filed
12/17/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/06/1996Submitted
11/06/1996MattConv
11/06/1996Submission
11/06/1996Submission
11/06/1996Submitted
09/27/1996Letter Sent by the Court
09/25/1996Letter Received
02/29/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/16/1996Brief Filed
02/16/1996Case ready to be set
02/16/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/16/1996Case ready to be set
08/02/1995MattConv
06/13/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/05/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/26/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/26/1995Motion for Relief DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/26/1995Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
05/19/1995MattConv
05/18/1995Supplemental Transcript filed
05/18/1995Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law Due
05/10/1995Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
05/09/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/09/1995Motion for Leave to File
04/24/1995Brief Filed
04/18/1995Letter Sent by the Court
12/20/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/01/1994Order Entered
09/21/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/19/1994Motion for Relief Filed
09/13/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/05/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Denied
07/22/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
06/30/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/21/1994MattConv
06/21/1994Statement of Facts Filed
06/20/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/13/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
06/06/1994Transcript Filed
06/06/1994Transcript Tendered
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/30/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
03/30/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/05/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Robert George Dohoney
F93-03674-V
50 yrs TDC