judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-94-00625-CR
05-94-00625-CR
04/15/1994
Robbery
Hill, Matthew
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/10/1997Mandate Issued
07/10/1997Mandate Issued
06/19/1997Mandate due to be issued
06/04/1997Case Returned from Higher Ct.
05/07/1997Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
02/06/1997Record Shipped
02/05/1997File Received by Court of Criminal Appeals
01/30/1997Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/31/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/31/1996Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/05/1996Submission
12/02/1996Letter Received
11/25/1996Letter Sent by the Court
08/01/1996Letter Filed
07/25/1996Response to Motion
06/21/1996Mandate issuedOtherwise Disposed
03/09/1996Opinion issued
04/28/1995Record Shipped
04/10/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/09/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/22/1995Submission
02/22/1995Submitted
02/22/1995Submission
02/22/1995Submitted
02/08/1995Motion for Postponement
02/08/1995Motion to Postpone DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/08/1995Submission
01/10/1995MattConv
11/03/1994Motion to Supplement Record DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
10/03/1994Response to Motion
09/29/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/23/1994Brief Filed
09/23/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
09/23/1994Motion to Supplement Record
08/17/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
08/12/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/20/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/11/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/20/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/14/1994Brief Filed
06/09/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/27/1994Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/20/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/17/1994Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
05/10/1994Transcript Filed
05/10/1994Transcript Tendered
05/06/1994Exhibits Filed
05/06/1994MattConv
05/06/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/06/1994Statement of Facts Filed
04/25/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
04/15/1994Notice Sent
04/15/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/18/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
02/25/1994Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/10/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable F. H. Entz
F93-67613-M
18 yrs TDC