judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

ARMINTA LOIS SCOTT, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN v. J. S. ABERCROMBIE COMPANY

Case: A-4699
A-4699
05/20/1954
Application for Writ of Error
ARMINTA LOIS SCOTT, INDIVIDUALLY AND AS GUARDIAN
J. S. ABERCROMBIE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/30/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/24/1954Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/02/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filedRespondent
06/26/1954Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
06/05/1954Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/31/1954Response to PetitionRespondent
05/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1954Motion for Rehearing
11/24/1954Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/02/1954Response to Amicus Curiae Brief filed
06/26/1954Amicus Curiae Brief received
06/05/1954Reply to Response
05/31/1954Response to Petition
05/20/1954Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/20/1954Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Arminta Lois Scott, Individually and as GuardianPetitioner
Texas State Federation of LaborAmicus Curiae
J. S. Abercrombie CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information