judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RODRIGUEZ (PEDRO) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34908
Short Caption:RODRIGUEZ (PEDRO) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR981170Classification:Criminal Appeal - Life - Direct/Proper Person
Disqualifications:AgostiCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Agosti. Sat in district court proceedings.
09/30/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
09/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09412
11/19/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP99B-RR/CY/ML 99-11568
12/15/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-12634
12/15/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/05/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2000. 99-12634