judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHRISTOPHER DAVID HARRELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0035)
Case Number:S-11-0035Case Docketed On:02/02/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:CHRISTOPHER DAVID HARRELL v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:CHRISTOPHER DAVID HARRELL, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChristopher David HarrellDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Gregory A. Phillips
Leda M. Pojman

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law, Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Evidence
Opinion Number:2011 WY 129
Citation:261 P.3d 235

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/02/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/02/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/02/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/04/2011Record - Court Reporter's certificate of completionRecordCourt Reporter's certificate of completionFinal
03/18/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/18/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/21/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/22/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/04/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
05/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/13/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
05/18/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/18/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/16/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the Court.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/04/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/04/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/04/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
10/28/2011Event - Rejected Filing - returned "writ of review" (petition for rehearing) to appellant as untimely.EventRejected FilingFinal