judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4065
B-4065
06/07/1973
Application for Writ of Error
ROBERT LEE MOODY, SHEARN MOODY, JR.
PAUL R. HAAS, S. MARCUS GREER, J. M. LYKES AND WILLIAM L. MOODY, IV, JOHN L. HILL, ATTORNEY GENERAL OF TEXAS
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/19/1973Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/18/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
10/15/1973Motion for RehearingRespondent
09/13/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
08/02/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/24/1973Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
07/20/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
07/20/1973Response to PetitionPetitioner
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/23/1973Response to Motion filed
10/19/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/18/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/15/1973Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/13/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
08/02/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/24/1973Amicus Curiae Brief received
07/20/1973Response to Petition
07/20/1973Response to Petition
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/07/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
06/07/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SHEARN MOODY, JR.Petitioner
John L. Hill, Attorney General of TexasRespondent
Robert Lee MoodyPetitioner
Houston Endowment Co.Amicus Curiae
Brown Foundation, Inc.Amicus Curiae
Mary Moody NorthenAmicus Curiae
Paul R. Haas, S. Marcus Greer, J. M. Lykes and William L. Moody, IVRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information