judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

PAUL H. JORDAN V. KISTEN PISANI, ET AL

Case Information: 10-CV-1625
Short Caption:PAUL H. JORDAN V. KISTEN PISANI, ET ALClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB6321-10Filed Date:12/22/2010

Opening Event Date:12/22/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:04/01/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantPaul H. Jordan YPro SeN
AppelleeKisten Pisani N
Michael K. Lowman NN
AppelleeCarlina Powell NPro SeN
AppelleeShaji Zachariah NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/22/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/14/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall w/n 20 days from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been IMPROPERLY FILED sicne final order has been DESIGNATED FOR REVIEW... (BY: ETW)
01/14/2011TMC - OTSC - motion for summary affirmance - motion to strike summary affirmance/oppo
01/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE (PISANI)
02/08/2011APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to dismiss aple's motion for summary affirmance LW
03/11/2011 ORDERED that the APPEAL IS DISMISSED. See DC App. R. 13 (a);... It is *****MORE*****
03/11/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE IS DENIED AS MOOT... (RDKRTE) (rf)
03/11/2011DISMISSED
04/01/2011MANDATE ISSUED