judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

EDWARDS VS. COLD SPRINGS 2000

Case Information: 34907
Short Caption:EDWARDS VS. COLD SPRINGS 2000Court:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 35898
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CV9903876Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:LeavittCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/30/1999OtherDisqualification of Justice Leavitt. Law firm of Hale, Lane, Peek, Dennison, Howard & Anderson.
09/30/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
09/30/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09377
09/30/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
12/13/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." fn1[We have considered the proper person documents received from appellant]. SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-12473
02/18/2000Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. "Rehearing denied." fn1[Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.] SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-02593
03/07/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-03599
03/07/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/22/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 10, 2000.