judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4053
B-4053
06/04/1973
Application for Writ of Error
CITY OF AUSTIN
W. C. COLTEN, JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/17/1974Amicus Curiae Brief receivedAmicus Curiae
04/17/1974Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
04/04/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
04/03/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/30/1974Post submission brief filedPetitioner
12/21/1973Post submission brief filedRespondent
12/13/1973Post submission brief filedPetitioner
11/06/1973Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
06/15/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
06/04/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/16/1977Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
01/27/1977Motion to Withdraw Filed
04/17/1974Amicus Curiae Brief received
04/17/1974Brief in Support of Petition
04/04/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/03/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
03/20/1974Opinion issued
01/30/1974Post submission brief filed
12/21/1973Post submission brief filed
12/13/1973Post submission brief filed
11/06/1973Supplemental Brief filed
10/03/1973Document received (See Remarks)
06/15/1973Response to Petition
06/04/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
06/04/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Consulting Engineers Council of TexasAmicus Curiae
City of AustinPetitioner
W. C. Colten, Jr.Respondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information