judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00095-CV
02-94-00095-CV
04/21/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Denton County, Texas and Weldon Lucas, Sheriff of Denton County, Texas
Golden, Jr., Donald Gene d/b/a North Texas Bonding Company
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/09/1995Mandate Issued
11/23/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/12/1994Submitted
10/12/1994Submission
06/10/1994Submission
05/11/1994Brief Filed
04/21/1994No Description Available.
04/21/1994Submission
04/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/09/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Lucas, Sheriff, WeldonAppellantHon. Joe Bridges
County of Denton, TexasAppellantHon. Joe Bridges
Golden, Jr., Donald Gene D/b/aAppelleeLloyd D. Odle
North Texas Bonding CompanyAppelleeLloyd D. Odle
Trial Court Information
16th District Court
Denton
Honorable John K. Narsutis
93-10119-16