judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 02-94-00151-CR
02-94-00151-CR
04/21/1994
Burglary
White, James Lee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/12/1995Mandate Issued
08/24/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/14/1995Submitted
06/14/1995Submission
03/09/1995Brief Filed
03/09/1995Case ready to be set
03/09/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/01/1995Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/10/1994Brief Filed
10/10/1994Submission
05/18/1994No Description Available.
05/06/1994No Description Available.
04/28/1994Submission
04/28/1994No Description Available.
04/21/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
04/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/12/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
White, James LeeCriminal - AppellantRoger D. Shipman
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasKathleen Walsh
Trial Court Information
158th District Court
Denton
Honorable Phillip O. Vick
F-93-0349-B
LIFE, IDTDCJ