judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Court Of Criminal Appeals Record

Case: PD-0343-94
PD-0343-94
03/29/1994
PDR Case Type
SALUGHTER, LARRY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
05/02/1994RESPONSE FILEDState
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/01/1994FINAL DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
06/15/1994PDR DISPRefused
05/02/1994RESPONSE FILED
03/29/1994PDR FILED
03/29/1994PDR FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/12/1994STOREDRETURNED COA
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
SALUGHTER, LARRYApplicant (writs)/Appellant's (cases)Sharon Slopis
STATE OF TEXASStateJohn B. Holmes
Court of Appeals Information:
01-93-00147-CR
AFF 2-17-94
1st Court of Appeals
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
Honorable J. BRADLEY SMITH
646931