judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FOP MPD LABOR COMMITTEE

Case Information: 10-CV-1600
Short Caption:DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA V. FOP MPD LABOR COMMITTEEClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Lead:10-CV-1600Consolidated: 10-CV-1626 , 12-CV-0207
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB5557-08Filed Date:12/17/2010

Opening Event Date:12/17/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:03/21/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:05/06/2013
Argued/Submitted:11/07/2013
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/17/2013

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
Appellant-Cross-AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Todd S. KimNY
Mary L. WilsonYY
Appellee-Cross-AppellantFraternal Order of Police MPD Labor CommitteeN
Paul A. FennYY
Barbara E. DuvallNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/17/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/07/2011 ORDERED that appellant shall, W/N 20 DAYS from the date of this order SHOW CAUSE why this appeal should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL and NON-APPEALABLE order...(BY: ETW)
01/07/2011TMC - OTSC (CV1600) - OTSC (CV1626) - District's ROTSC - FOP's ROTSC
01/14/2011 ORDERED, SS, that APPEAL NOS. 10CV1600 & 10CV1626 ARE HEREBY CONSOLIDATED for all purposes. It is *****MORE*****
01/14/2011 FURTHER ORDRED that cross-appellant shall, w/n 20 days from the date of this order, SHOW CAUSE why appeal no. 10CV1626 should not be dismissed for having been taken from a NON-FINAL ORDER...It is *****MORE*****
01/14/2011 FURTHER ORDERED that cross-appellee's RESPONSE IN APPEAL 10CV1600 remains due on or before Janaury 27, 2011. (BY: ETW)
01/28/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by D.C. Mary L. Wilson, Esq.
02/03/2011RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE aple cross aplt (filed by: Paul Fenn)
03/11/2011 ORDERED, that the SHOW CAUSE ORDERS are HEREBY DISCHARGED. It is *****MORE*****
03/11/2011 F/ORDERED that appellant shall, within 20 days from the date of this order, complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED appellant's failure to respond to any order of this court, including this order, shall subject this appeal to dismissal without further notice for lack of prosecution. See D.C. App. R. 13(a). (GLPRFE) (jl)
03/18/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) - (10-CV-1626) (F.O.P. - atty Paul Fenn) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/31/08) (elp)
03/21/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD#1( 18-pgs/tape 10/31/08 proc.)w/cd
03/21/2011RECORD COMPLETED
03/29/2011RECORD INDEX 10cv1626& 1600
03/31/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (D.C.) (RT-NEEDED/RT-ORDERED for 10/31/08) (elp) **SEE RT entry above on 3/21/11 (elp)
04/04/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that the briefs shall be filed as follows: Opening brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, and the appendix within 40 days from the date of this order; Responsive brief (not to exceed 50 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, including the opening brief of cross-appeal, within 30 days from the date of service of the opening brief of appellant/cross-appellee; Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellant/cross-appellee, including the response to the cross-appeal brief, within 21 days from the date of service of the responsive brief of appellee/cross-appellant; and Reply brief (not to exceed 20 pages) of appellee/cross-appellant, if any, within 21 days from the date of service of the reply brief of appellant/cross-appellee. (JAC) elp
05/13/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 30 days
05/26/2011 On consideration of appellant/cross- appellee's motion for enlargement of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant/cross-appellee's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before June 15, 2011. (JAC) elp
06/15/2011APLT-X-APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF 30 days
07/05/2011 On consideration of appellant/cross- appellee's motion for an enlargement of time to file the brief and the appendix, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant/cross-appellee's brief and the appendix shall be filed on or before July 15, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (JAC) elp
07/15/2011FiledMotion To Stay Lower Court/Agency Order- and to stay briefing (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Denied
07/19/2011FiledTMC-D.C.'s MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING & APPEAL;OPPO;REPLY
07/22/2011FiledOpposition cross aplt to oppo to aplt's cross aple's motion to stay briefing and to stay trial court's order pending appeal (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
07/28/2011FiledReply to FOP's oppo to mtoion to stay trial court's order pending appeal (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
08/04/2011FiledOrder Denying MOTION TO STAY and APPELLANT'S BRIEF/APPENDIX SHALL BE FILED IN 20 DAYS
08/24/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File cross aple Other (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
08/29/2011FiledOpposition - to aplt's motion for extension of time to file brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
09/07/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting aplt/cross-appellee's motion for extension of time to file brief and appendix to 9/23/11.
09/23/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 45 days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
10/11/2011FiledMotion For Leave to File (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)Granted
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Leave to File Opposition (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledOpposition to motion for ext of time to file brief. (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
10/21/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Brief for 45 days (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/07/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal - pending resolution of Superior Court Civil Rule 60(b) motion below (Titled: Motion of D.C. to hold brfing in abeyance pending resolution...) (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
11/15/2011FiledOpposition to aplt cross aple contested motion to hold briefing in abyance pending resolution of superior court R. 60 (b) motion below (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
11/15/2011FiledReply to FOP's oppo to motion to hold in abeyance (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
12/01/2011FiledOrder Sua Sponte Holding Appellant/Cross-Appellee's Motion to Hold Briefing in Abeyance pending resolution of Super Ct. Civ. R. 60 (b) motion
01/03/2012FiledStatement from aplt regarding status report of D.C. rule 60 (b) motion pending in superior court (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
02/02/2012FiledStatement regarding rule (60) motion pending in Superior Court (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
02/24/2012FiledOrder Granting Motion To Consolidate 10CV1600, 10CV1626 & 12CV207 and...
02/24/2012VacatedORDER THAT THE SUPERIOR COURT FEBRUARY 15, 2012 ORDER IS ADMINISTRATIVELY STAYED and APPELLEE SHALL FILE ITS OPPOSITION NO LATER THAN MARCH 6, 2012 and THE DISTRICT'S MOTIONS TO STAY and to FILE UNDER SEAL ARE HELD IN ABEYANCE
02/24/2012FiledTMC//DISTRICT'S MOTION TO STAY & TO FILE UNDER SEAL (IN ABEYANCE)//OPPOSITION//REPLY
03/06/2012FiledOpposition to appellant/cross appellee's emergency motion to stay trial cour'ts order pending appeal and motion to consolidate appeals (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
03/07/2012FiledReply by the District of Columbia to Fraternal Order of Police to it's emergency motion to stay trial court's order pending appeal (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
03/26/2012FiledORDER VACATING THE ADMINISTRATIVE STAY and GRANTING THE DISTRICT'S MOTION TO STAY THE TRIAL COURT'S FEBRUARY 15, 2012 ORDER and GRANTING THE DISTRICT'S MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL
04/11/2012FiledRecord Index (12-CV-207)
04/27/2012FiledBriefing Order
05/14/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
06/04/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
07/23/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
08/09/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
09/21/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
10/05/2012FiledOpposition to appellant cross appellee's motion for additional enlargement of time to file brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
10/16/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
11/05/2012FiledAppendix (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
12/05/2012FiledBrief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
12/05/2012FiledSupplemental Appendix (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
12/17/2012FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
12/26/2012FiledOpposition to appellant's cross appellee's motion for enlargement of time to file brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
01/15/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File Reply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
03/04/2013FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief Reply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)Granted
03/13/2013FiledOpposition to Motion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
03/18/2013FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion For Extension Of Time to File reply brief Reply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
05/06/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellant-Cross-Appellee)
05/06/2013FiledBriefing Completed
05/24/2013FiledReply Brief (Appellee-Cross-Appellant)
06/19/2013FiledACTION - Ready for Calendaring - Regular
06/19/2013FiledLetter To Counsel/Party Re Future Calendaring
09/30/2013FiledACTION - Calendar notice sent
11/07/2013FiledArgued Before Assoicate Judge Glickman, Assoicate Judge Easterly, and Senior Judge Ferren. (Mary L. Wilson, Esq. for Appellant) (Paul A. Fenn, Esq. for Appellee).
11/15/2013FiledRemanded
12/17/2013FiledMandate (10-CV-1600, 10-CV-1627, 12-CV-207)