judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WHITTLESEA BLUE CAB VS. HAN

Case Information: 34889
Short Caption:WHITTLESEA BLUE CAB VS. HANCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A366004Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:09/30/1999 / Levitt, LansfordSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
09/27/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Raleigh, Hunt & McGarry, P.C.--check no. 1524
09/27/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09201
09/30/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Lansford W. Levitt. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/14/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-12598
01/11/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. (Revised) The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 00-00454
01/24/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant has 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or inform this court of the status of this appeal. 00-01045
02/04/2000Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 00-01836
02/23/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference held in this matter and the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. fn1[Respondents Baker Commodities and Alphonso Ray England were inadvertently omitted from the caption on this court's docket. The clerk shall amend the caption on this court's docket consistent with the caption appearing on this order.] 00-02848
02/23/2000Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.