judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED

Case Heading (S-09-0069)
Case Number:S-09-0069Case Docketed On:04/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fifth Judicial District Park CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Property, Conveyances and Security Transactions (Title 34)
Short Title:RONALD L. SIMEK v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED
Full Title:RONALD L. SIMEK, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. STACY TATE, ADMINISTRATOR OF THE ESTATE OF CAROL B. BREHM, DECEASED, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRonald L. SimekAndrea L. Richard
Jennifer Ann Golden
AppelleeStacy TateChris Dull Edwards
William L. Simpson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
04/02/2009Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
04/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
04/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
04/08/2009Notice-Internal - Recusal memo - Justice Golden recused.Notice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
04/24/2009Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
05/14/2009Notice-Incoming - Other - District Court Pleading, Notice of PaymentNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/15/2009Event - Phone Call - from counsel for appellant. She will be submitting a motion and proposed order for dismissal of this case.EventPhone CallFinal
05/20/2009Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
05/21/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Stipulated Motion for Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (Copies on legal paper with unredacted attachement)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/09/2009Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
06/09/2009Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
06/09/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal