judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00316-CV
01-94-00316-CV
03/29/1994
Original proceeding for writ of mandamus (Gov't 22.221(a), (b))
Larry Gray v. Katherine Tyra
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/18/1994Motion for rehearing was not filed
05/03/1994Order enteredOverruled
04/29/1994Motion for rehearing filed
04/21/1994Opinion issuedOverruled
04/21/1994Opinion issuedOverruled
03/29/1994Motion for leave to file writ of mandamus
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/18/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateRelatorLarry Gray
Trial Court Information