judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-94-00297-CR
14-94-00297-CR
03/29/1994
Other Drug Possession
Delcid, Josa Misael
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/15/1996Case stored
04/01/1996Mandate due to be issued
04/01/1996Mandate Issued
04/01/1996Mandate Issued
03/18/1996Petition for discretionary review due
03/06/1996No motion for rehearing FILED
03/01/1996Motion for rehearing DUE
02/15/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
02/15/1996Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
01/24/1996Submitted
01/24/1996Submission
01/24/1996Submitted
12/13/1995Submission
08/09/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
08/09/1994Case ready to be set
08/09/1994Case ready to be set
07/27/1994Brf.FILED-Argu.-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
07/14/1994Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
06/28/1994Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
05/26/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/26/1994Statement of Facts FILED - ANT,APP
05/18/1994Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
05/18/1994Supplement to motion FILED - ANT,APE,STA
05/17/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
05/05/1994Ext.time file state.of facts DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/05/1994Extend time to file transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APEGRANTED
05/05/1994Motion to consolidate DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APPGRANTED
05/05/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript DISPOSED-ANT,APE,STAGRANTED
05/05/1994No description available.
05/05/1994Transcript FILED
05/02/1994Motion to consolidate FILED-ANT,APE,APP
04/29/1994Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
04/29/1994Extend time to file transcript FILED-ANT,APE
04/29/1994Mtn.to supplement transcript FILED-ANT,APE,STA
04/19/1994No description available.
04/14/1994Transcript received only; mtn. pending
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/16/1994Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
02/16/1994Date of Sentence
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/01/1996Case StoredCase stored
05/10/2017Case StoredCase archived
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantMichael A. McEnrue
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasAlan Curry
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
263rd District Court
Harris
658019
75 yrs. TDC