judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00130-CV
09-94-00130-CV
03/29/1994
Miscellaneous civil
Sea Mar, Inc. and Unocal Corporation
Rumore, Ronnie Salvedore
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/06/1994Mandate Issued
06/06/1994MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
04/20/1994Order EnteredRemanded to the trial court to conduct a hearing
04/15/1994Motion to Remand Appeal filed
04/07/1994Motion for ext of time to file cost bond disposedMotion or Writ Granted
04/06/1994Motion for ext of time to file cost bond filed
03/29/1994Motion for ext of time to file cost bond filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/06/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unocal CorporationAppellantGeorge Michael Jamail
Appleman, JohnnyDistrict or County ClerksJohnny Appleman
Trial Court Information
172nd District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Donald Floyd
E-139,040