judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00311-CR
01-94-00311-CR
03/29/1994
Other Drug Possession
Malvo, Charles Andrai
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/01/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/01/1996Mandate issued - criminal or civil
05/10/1996Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
04/03/1996Case file received by higher Court or agency.
02/13/1996Case file received by higher Court or agency.
02/09/1996Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
01/22/1996Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
01/20/1996Writ Due
01/05/1996Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/21/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
08/11/1995Submission
08/07/1995Brief Due
08/01/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
08/01/1995Case ready to be set
08/01/1995Case ready to be set
07/13/1995Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/13/1995Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
07/13/1995Statement of Facts Due
07/13/1995Statement of facts filed
07/05/1995Statement of facts filedOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
06/28/1995Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
06/20/1995Letter of inquiry received, usually from an inmate.
05/25/1995Letter of inquiry received, usually from an inmate.
10/21/1994Order enteredOrder trial court hearing-no brief filed
07/26/1994Brief due for retained counsel
05/25/1994Transcript filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/28/1994Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
03/28/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/30/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
TEXAS, THE STATE OFCriminal - State of TexasDaniel C. McCrory
StateCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
StateCriminal - AppellantGreg S. Velasquez
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable LUPE SALINAS
669,639
36 yrs tdc