judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00085-CV
07-94-00085-CV
03/29/1994
Miscellaneous civil
State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Peck, Emma S. and American States Insurance Company
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/07/1995Mandate Issued
06/21/1995Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/08/1995Motion for Rehearing Filed
05/30/1995Opinion issuedAFFIRMED IN PART AND REVERSED IN PART
10/12/1994Submitted
10/12/1994Submission
10/03/1994Supplemental Brief Filed
09/16/1994Submission
07/25/1994Brief Filed
07/25/1994Case ready to be set
07/07/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
07/06/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
07/05/1994Brief Filed
06/13/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filedGRANT
05/31/1994Brief Filed
05/06/1994Motion to Supplement the Record Disposed
05/04/1994Do not use
05/02/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
05/02/1994Motion to Supplement the Record Filed
04/29/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
03/31/1994Do not use
03/29/1994Do not use
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/31/2005Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Peck, Emma S. And American StaAppelleeJohn Simpson
Erik Ekvall
E. Thomas Bishop
Jack O. Nelson, Jr.
State Farm Mutual Automobile IAppellantRalph H. Brock
George L. Thompson
Trial Court Information
72nd District Court
Lubbock
91-536,047