judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 7th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 07-94-00084-CR
07-94-00084-CR
03/29/1994
Other Drug Possession
Campbell, James Edward
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/25/1995Mandate Issued
05/09/1995Case Returned from Higher Court
02/09/1995Case Forwarded to Higher Court
02/07/1995Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
12/06/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/21/1994Submitted
10/21/1994Submission
09/20/1994Submission
08/08/1994Brief Filed
08/08/1994Case ready to be set
07/11/1994Brief Filed
06/07/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief disp.GRANT
06/07/1994Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/12/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispGRANT
05/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/10/1994Do not use
05/06/1994Do not use
03/29/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/25/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMichael West
Campbell, James EdwardCriminal - AppellantDavid Martinez
Trial Court Information
364th District Court
Lubbock
Honorable Bradley S. Underwood
93-416,241
45 yrs, TDC