judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-94-00129-CR
09-94-00129-CR
03/29/1994
Drug Possession
Williams, Christopher Jordan
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/07/1994Mandate Issued
11/07/1994MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
09/23/1994Corrected copy of judgment
09/22/1994Order EnteredDismissed
09/20/1994Motion for Dismissal Filed
07/21/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/20/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/19/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/11/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/04/1994Transcript Filed
03/29/1994Notice of Appeal Filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/07/1994Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCourt reporterKellie Derouen
Dillard, BeverlyDistrict or County ClerksDebbie Usoff
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasRodney D. Conerly
Williams, Christopher JordanAppellantDouglas M. Barlow
Trial Court Information
252nd District Court
Jefferson
61308
10 years