judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 06-94-00183-CR
06-94-00183-CR
03/29/1994
Assault or Attempted Murder
Smith, Roy Earl
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/21/1996Motion DisposedOverruled
05/13/1996MOTION FILED
09/20/1995Mandate Issued
07/24/1995Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/21/1995Submitted
06/21/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/21/1995Submission
06/13/1995Brief Filed
06/13/1995Holding for Record
06/13/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/31/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/25/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/17/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/09/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/30/1995Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/23/1995Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1995Brief Filed
02/09/1995Order issued
12/14/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/07/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1994LETTER
09/29/1994Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/22/1994Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/15/1994Statement of Facts Filed
07/27/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
07/19/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/08/1994Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
05/31/1994Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
03/29/1994Transcript Filed
03/29/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/20/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Smith, Roy EarlAppellantRussell Brooks
Trial Court Information
8th District Court
Franklin
6736
99 Years