judyrecords
594 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-94-00394-CV
01-94-00394-CV
04/21/1994
Miscellaneous/other civil
Johnson, Wayne
Judge Robert E. May and Dan Morales
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/13/1995Motion for rehearing was not filed
12/29/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/29/1994Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/13/1994Submitted
12/13/1994Submission
12/13/1994Submitted
11/21/1994Submission
10/14/1994Case ready to be set
10/14/1994Case ready to be set
07/28/1994Brief filed-oral argument has been waived
07/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
06/07/1994Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/27/1994Notice of dismissal
04/21/1994Transcript filed
04/21/1994Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
03/18/1994Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/13/1995Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StatePRO SER. Wayne Johnson
Trial Court Information
149th District Court
Brazoria
Honorable JAMES R. GAYLE
93I0006-2