judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LEANY VS. CITY OF HENDERSON

Case Information: 34625
Short Caption:LEANY VS. CITY OF HENDERSONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A401750Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:08/16/1999 / Christensen, CarlSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:06/06/2000How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/06/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lybarger, Bunin & Bunin--check no. 1507.
08/06/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07229
08/06/1999Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Proceedings: June 28, 1999. To Court Reporter: Carrie A. Hansen. 99-07235
08/11/1999TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: June 28, 1999. Court Reporter: Carrie A. Hansen. 99-07411
08/16/1999Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Carl J. Christensen. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
09/16/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 8, 1999. 99-08747
09/30/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: October 12, 1999. 99-09382
10/15/1999Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 99-10025
11/17/1999Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellants: 15 days to file the docketing statement; 70 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellants). 99-11414
12/01/1999Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 99-11986
01/26/2000BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 1/25/00. 00-01289
01/26/2000AppendixFiled Appendix to Opening Brief. 00-01290
02/25/2000BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Fed Ex 2/24/00. 00-02994
03/27/2000BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: Fed ex 3/24/00. 00-04847
06/06/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted as of the date of this order, on the record and briefs filed herein. 00-09472
06/06/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
08/17/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 00-14353
09/12/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-14436
09/12/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
10/06/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 2, 2000. 00-14436