judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CHET ALAN CHRISTENSEN v. CARBON COUNTY, WYOMING, A County of the state of Wyoming, by and through its Board of County Commissioners

Case Heading (06-222)
Case Number:06-222Case Docketed On:09/27/2006
Linked To: S-07-0034
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Counties (Title 18)
Short Title:CHET ALAN CHRISTENSEN v. CARBON COUNTY, WYOMING, A County of the state of Wyoming, by and through its Board of County Commissioners
Full Title:CHET ALAN CHRISTENSEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. CARBON COUNTY, WYOMING, A County of the state of Wyoming, by and through its Board of County Commissioners, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantChet Alan ChristensenDaniel Barry Frank
AppelleeThe Board of County Commissioners of Carbon County, WyomingThomas A. Thompson

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/27/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/27/2006Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/27/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/14/2006Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
01/02/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record. (letter from attorney stated they had enclosed and wanted a file stamped copy returned in enclosed envelope, but no extra copy or envelope enclosed, so none sent)BriefAppelleeFinal
01/04/2007Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
01/16/2007Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
01/16/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/16/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
01/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal. Four volumes, original papers.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/01/2007Order - Consolidating cases. Order granting motion to consolidate appeals. (S-07-0034 is consolidated with 06-222 for the purposes of opinion)OrderConsolidating casesFinal
07/19/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended index (Second)Notice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
08/06/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, two volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
08/10/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
10/25/2007Motion - Dismiss - stipulatedMotionDismiss - stipulatedFinal
10/25/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
10/25/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/30/2007Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 10/29/07 by L. Glode.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal