judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

FISHER, JAMES UNITED STATES

Case Information: 80-CF-0619
Short Caption:FISHER, JAMES UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F45539-76Filed Date:04/15/1980

Opening Event Date:04/15/1980Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/24/1980Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/09/1981
Argued/Submitted:11/19/1981
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901FISHER, JAMES UNITED STATES
04/15/1980FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/24/1980FiledRecord Completed
07/09/1981FiledBriefing Completed
11/19/1981FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/25/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition