judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MINERAL COUNTY VS. STATE, DEPT OF CONSERVATION

Case Information: 36352
Short Caption:MINERAL COUNTY VS. STATE, DEPT OF CONSERVATIONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Mineral Co. - Eleventh Judicial District - NONEClassification:Original Proceeding - Civil - Mandamus/Prohibition
Disqualifications:Case Status:Notice in Lieu of Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:02/09/2001 at 9:30 AMOral Argument Location:Carson City
Submission Date:02/09/2001How Submitted:After Oral Argument

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
06/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Petition for Writ of Mandamus or Prohibition. 00-10926
06/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Points and Authorities in Support of Petition for Writ. 00-10927
06/26/2000Petition/WritFiled Affidavit in Support of Petition for Writ. Affidavit of Louis D. Thompson. 00-10928
06/27/2000Filing Fee Returned Filing Fee. Check No.1617 in the amount of $200 returned to Campbell & Stone. (No filing fee due--governmental agency.)
06/27/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice of Procedural Deficiency. Proof of service on all parties to the action. Due Date: 10 days
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ - Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resouces). 00-11936
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ of Mandamus-Nevada Department of Conservation and Natural Resources). 00-11944
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ of Mandamus-State of Nevada). 00-11945
07/11/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. (Petition for Writ of Mandamus -Nevada State Enginee). 00-11946
07/17/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Answer Writ Petition. Answer due from respondents: 30 days from the date of this order. 00-12239
08/03/2000MotionFiled Stipulation. (To file Answer). 00-13504
08/08/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Representation of Respondents. Deputy Attorney General William J. Frey has assumed responsibility for representing the interests of the above-named Respondents. 00-13790
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate (Marc D. Fink). 00-13911
08/10/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Associate (Michael D. Axline). 00-13912
08/11/2000Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order. The stipulation filed August 3, 2000, is treated as an unopposed motion. Respondents shall have to and including September 30, 2000, to file and serve the answer to the petition for writ of mandamus and prohibition. 00-14093
08/22/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Attorneys Marc D. Fink and Michael D. Axline shall be permitted to appear on behalf of petitioners in Docket Number 36352. Nevada attorney Richard G. Campbell, of the law firm of Campbell and Stone, shall be responsible for all matters petitioners in this matter. 00-14717
09/28/2000MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. (file an amicus curiae brief in opposition to the petition for writ of mandamus). (Humboldt River Basin Water Authority). 00-17179
09/28/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion for Leave to file a Brief of an Amicus Curiae. (City of Fallon) 00-17186
10/02/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. 00-17398
10/02/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. 00-17399
10/03/2000MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Intervene of Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County, Nevada and City of Yerington, Nevada. 00-17470
10/03/2000Other Other. Received Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition of Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County, Nevada and City of Yerington. 00-17474
10/13/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Brief in Amicus Curiae, or, in the Alternative, Motion for Leave of Court to file Brief in Amicus Curiae. 00-18255
10/18/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. Order Granting Motions to file Amicus Curiae Briefs. The HRBWA and the City of Fallon shall have 15 days from the date of this order to file their amicus curiae briefs. 00-18430
10/30/2000BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief in Amicus Curiae of the Humboldt River Basin Water Authority. 00-18256
11/01/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant the application to intervene, and direct the clerk of this court to add the Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County and the City of Yerington to the caption and the docket as respondents. We also direct the clerk of this court to file the documents submitted by the Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County and the City of Yerington, received on October 3, 2000. 00-19196
11/01/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Answer of Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County and the City of Yerington to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition. 00-17472
11/01/2000Petition/WritFiled Answer to Petition for Writ. Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition of Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County and the City of Yerington. 00-17474
11/01/2000AppendixFiled Appendix. Appendix of Walker River Irrigation District, Lyon County and the City of Yerington, Vols. 1 and 2. 00-17475
11/02/2000BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief in Amicus Curiae of the City of Fallon. 00-19273
11/13/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-19777
11/13/2000MotionFiled Motion for Permission to File Document. Petitioners' Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition. 00-19873
11/13/2000Petition/WritReceived Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners' [Proposed] Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition. 00-19874
11/20/2000Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. 00-20374
11/21/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. We grant Petitioners' motion for leave to file a reply brief in support of petition for writ of mandamus and writ of prohibition. The clerk of this court shall forthwith file "petitioners' [proposed] reply in support of petition for writ of mandamus and writ prohibition." Cause appearing, the Town's "motion for leave of court to file brief in amicus curiae" is granted. Accordingly, the Town of Walker Lake, Nevada shall have 7 days from the date of this order to file and serve their amicus brief. Fn1[We note that attorney James Belford Brown signed the Town's motion. Attorney Brown shall 15 have days fromt the date of this order to comply with SCR 42(13) and submit to this court a certificate of compliance]. 00-20478
11/21/2000Petition/WritFiled Reply to Answer to Petition. Petitioners' [Proposed] Reply in Support of Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Writ of Prohibition. 00-19874
11/22/2000MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Reply Brief in Support of Petition; Points and Authorities. 00-20599
12/01/2000BriefFiled Amicus Brief. Brief Amicus Curiae in Support of Petitioners' Brief. 00-20974
12/08/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order Denying Motion. On November 13, 2000, petitioners filed a motion for leave to file a reply brief to respondents' answers to the petition filed in this matter. On November 21, 2000, this court granted petitioners' motion. On November 22, 2000, respondents filed an opposition. We elect to treat respondents' opposition as a motion for reconsideration of our November 21, 2000, order. We deny respondents' motion. We caution petitioners that in taking this matter under consideration we will disregard any matters not properly presented before this court. 00-21466
12/20/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice Scheduling Oral Argument. Oral Argument is scheduled for 30 minutes in Carson City on February 9, 2001 at 9:30 a.m. (En Banc)
12/27/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, attorney Brown has not complied with our November 21, 2000, order. Attorney Brown shall have 10 days from the date of this order to comply with SCR 42(13) and submit to this court a certificate of compliance. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in this court striking the amicus curiae brief filed by attorney Brown. 00-22533
01/05/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Association of Counsel. The law firm of Herum, Crabtree & Brown hereby associates: Stanley Brown, Jr. in addition to present counsel of record. 01-00261
01/12/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Notice of Association of Counsel. 01-00783
01/24/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Oral Argument Reminder Notice.
02/08/2001Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. from KOLO TV Assignment Editor Adrienne Abbott requesting cameras in the courtroom for oral argument. (via FAX) 01-02661
02/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. A request having been made seeking access to the Supreme Court of Nevada for purposes of photographic or electronic coverage of the hearing to be held Friday, February 9, 2001, at 9:30 a.m., in this matter; and counsel for the parties having been advised of the request; it is hereby ordered that permission is granted. Adrienne Abbott of KOLO-TV is designated as pool coordinator for purposes of organizing and coordinating the orderly coverage of such proceedings by all participants. All equipment necessary to allow for such photographic or electronic coverage of such proceedings shall be placed in the courtroom before commencement of the hearing. 01-02663
02/09/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Deputy Attorney General Paul Taggart in place of Deputy A.G. William J. Frey as counsel for respondents. 01-02665
02/09/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. EN BANC-WM/CY/MS/DA/RR/ML/NB
04/11/2001Opinion/DispositionalFiled Authored Opinion. fn11[Since the filing of the petition, Peter Morros has retired from state service. Also, R. Michael Turnipseed has become the Director of the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, and Hugh Ricci is now the State Engineer.] " . . . we deny the petitions." Before the Court En Banc. By the Court, Young, J. We concur: Maupin, C.J., Agosti, J., Leavitt, J. and Becker, J. Rose, J., with whom Shearing, J., agrees, concurring. 117 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 23. En Banc. 01-06197
05/08/2001RemittiturIssued Notice in Lieu of Remittitur. 01-06272
05/08/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.