judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SCOTT RAYMOND BUDIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0038)
Case Number:S-09-0038Case Docketed On:03/02/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:SCOTT RAYMOND BUDIG v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SCOTT RAYMOND BUDIG, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantScott Raymond BudigHarry G. Bondi
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Constitutional Law - Federal, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct
Opinion Number:2010 WY 1
Citation:222 P.3d 148

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/02/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/02/2009Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
03/02/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/03/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/07/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of the AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/18/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleeEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/08/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/17/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, six volumes. Volumes I & II, Original Papers; Volumes III & IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Confidential Information; Volume VI, Exhibits (Record received two days late)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/17/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
07/02/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Smith for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
07/09/2009Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Harry Bondi for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
08/11/2009Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Harry G. Bondi for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
08/11/2009Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
01/04/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
01/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
01/20/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
01/20/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
01/20/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/25/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 1/21/10.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal