judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WAUGH VS. EICON

Case Information: 36351
Short Caption:WAUGH VS. EICONCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A405601Classification:Civil Appeal - Administrative Agency - General
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/07/2000 / Marks, DanielSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:01/10/2002How Submitted:On Briefs

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/26/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Craig P. Kenny & Associates--check no. 10052.
06/26/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-10922
06/28/2000Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 00-11040
07/07/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Daniel Marks. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
10/13/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: November 13, 2000. 00-18231
01/26/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Michael D. Wymer in place of Javier A. Arguello for respondent EICON. 01-01767
03/12/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: March 26, 2001. 01-04412
03/29/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 01-05524
03/29/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Docketing Statement. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) Due Date: 15 days
04/09/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-06073
04/18/2001Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. This court shall conduct a preliminary jurisdictional review of this appeal. Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); 120 days to file and serve opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). 01-06631
04/27/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-07111
05/24/2001BriefFiled Opening Brief. Mailed on: No postmark. 01-08720
05/24/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-08721
06/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Donald C. Smith, Deputy General Counsel and counsel of record for Employers Insurance Company of Nevada hereby consents to the substitution of counsel to the law firm of Beckett & Yott. 01-10012
06/20/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. 01-10433
06/22/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: 06/20/01. 01-10607
06/25/2001BriefFiled Answering Brief. Mailed on: Hand delivered 06/25/01. 01-10681
06/25/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Answering Brief. Respondent EICN's Amended Appendix. 01-10685
07/25/2001BriefFiled Reply Brief. Mailed on: 07/23/01. 01-12616
08/03/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Notice of Change of Address. Beckett & Yott. 01-13190
01/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Submit on Briefs. Order Submitting for Decision Without Oral Argument. Cause appearing, oral argument will not be scheduled and this appeal shall stand submitted for decision to the Northern Nevada Panel as of the date of this order on the briefs filed herein. NRAP 34(f)(1). 02-00689
01/10/2002Case Status Update Submitted for Decision. To the Northern Nevada Panel. NNP02-MS/RR/NB
03/08/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-04191
04/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-04351
04/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/15/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 4, 2002. 02-04351