judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SERGIO ANTONIO MARTINEZ V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

Case Information: 10-CT-1553
Short Caption:SERGIO ANTONIO MARTINEZ V. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIAClassification:Appeals - Criminal - DC - DC Non-Traffic
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CDC22827-09Filed Date:12/08/2010

Opening Event Date:12/08/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:12/21/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/29/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantSergio Antonio Martinez YPro SeN
AppelleeDistrict of ColumbiaN
Rosalyn Calbert GroceNY
John J. WoykovskyNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/08/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
12/21/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (33-pgs/tape 2/24/10 proc.)w/cd
12/21/2010RECORD COMPLETED
12/28/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Robert Hollander, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
12/28/2010APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Robert Hollander, Esquire
01/04/2011RECORD INDEX
01/04/2011RECORD COPIES
01/06/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
01/12/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
01/12/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (7pgs/Tape) 10/24/09 proc.
01/24/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (9pgs/Tape) 11/24/09 proc. w/CD
02/15/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
02/15/2011APPENDIX
03/21/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF for 90 days (no oppo).
03/28/2011 On consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before June 20, 2011. (By: JAC)
06/20/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF no oppo to 90 days
07/11/2011FiledOn consideration of appellee's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellee's brief shall be filed on or before September 19, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and grantd only upon a showing of good cause. (dfe)
09/19/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief (Appellee)Granted
09/23/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellee's motion for an extension of time to file the brief until October 3, 2011
10/03/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)
10/04/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE/OPPO
10/12/2011FiledOpposition to aplt's motion for summary affirmance (Appellant)
11/02/2011FiledOrder Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
11/02/2011FiledAffirmed
11/09/2011FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)
11/29/2011FiledMandate
11/29/2011FiledMandate