judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BARKLEY (JAMES) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34910
Short Caption:BARKLEY (JAMES) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C140381Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:02/17/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-09426
11/12/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 34633, 34660, 34722, 34836, 34848, 34871, 34910. 99-11144
02/17/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Vols. 1 and 2. Mailed on 02/14/00. 00-02518
02/17/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
09/13/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. We have reviewed the record on appeal and for the reasons stated in the attached order of the district court, we conclude that the district court properly denied appellant's petition. Briefing and oral argument are not warranted. " . . . we affirm the order of the district court." NNP00A-MS/DA/ML 00-16114
10/10/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-16207
10/10/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/29/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 18, 2000. 00-16207