judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

CELESTE C. GRYNBERG d/b/a GRYNBERG PETROLEUM COMPANY v. L & R EXPLORATION VENTURE, THOMAS L. KEMPNER, and TROF, INC.

Case Heading (S-11-0037)
Case Number:S-11-0037Case Docketed On:02/07/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:CELESTE C. GRYNBERG d/b/a GRYNBERG PETROLEUM COMPANY v. L & R EXPLORATION VENTURE, THOMAS L. KEMPNER, and TROF, INC.
Full Title:CELESTE C. GRYNBERG d/b/a GRYNBERG PETROLEUM COMPANY, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. L & R EXPLORATION VENTURE, THOMAS L. KEMPNER, and TROF, INC., Appellees (Defendants).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantCeleste C. GrynbergJonathon Isaac Aimone
William L. Hiser
AppelleeL & R Exploration VenturePaula Ann Fleck
Steve Andersen
Christina F. Gomez
AppelleeThomas L. KempnerPaula Ann Fleck
Steve Andersen
Christina F. Gomez
AppelleeTrof, Inc.Paula Ann Fleck
Steve Andersen
Christina F. Gomez

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Res judicata/Collateral estoppel
Opinion Number:2011 WY 134
Citation:261 P.3d 731 (Wyo. 2011)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/07/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/07/2011Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
02/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
03/25/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
03/28/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/09/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppelleesEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/10/2011Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2011Event - Other - E-filing service system error - service notification not sent by e-mail until 5/10/2011. Adjusted tickler date to reflect actual date of service by system.EventOtherFinal
05/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - William Hiser and/or Jon Aimone for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paula A. Fleck and Steve B. Anderson (to be admitted pro hac vice) for appellees.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/25/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/25/2011Motion - Admission pro hac viceMotionAdmission pro hac viceFinal
05/26/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission pro hac vice and entry of appearance for Steve Andersen; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Steve AndersenOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/27/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for admission pro hac vice and entry of appearance for Christina F. Gomez; and received proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Order - Pro hac vice - allow - Christina F. GomezOrderPro hac vice - allowFinal
05/27/2011Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
05/31/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Reply Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/31/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/10/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/10/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, three volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Transcripts.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/10/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
06/14/2011Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
06/14/2011Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court. (William L. Hiser and Jonathon Isaac Aimone, argument by Mr. Hiser for appellant; Paula Ann Fleck and Steve B. Andersen, argument by Mr. Anderson for appellees) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
09/21/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Chief Justice Kite writing for the Court. Court also awarded attorney fees and costs.OpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Incoming - Statement of costsNotice-IncomingStatement of costsFinal
10/10/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Appellees' statement of attorneys' fees and costsEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/01/2011Order - Awarding attorney fees and costsOrderAwarding attorney fees and costsFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
11/01/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
11/01/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
11/01/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
11/07/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for (undated).ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal
11/14/2011Notice-Incoming - Other - Satisfaction of Order awarding Attorney's Fees and Costs filed in District Court. Copy not retainedNotice-IncomingOtherFinal