judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-6516
A-6516
08/29/1957
Application for Writ of Error
ANTHONY PENALOZA
BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/23/1957Motion for RehearingPetitioner
09/18/1957Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/11/1957Response to PetitionRespondent
08/29/1957Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/29/1957Response to Motion filed
10/23/1957Motion for RehearingOverruled
09/18/1957Reply to Response
09/11/1957Response to Petition
08/30/1957Letter Filed
08/29/1957Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/29/1957Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
BAPTIST MEMORIAL HOSPITALRespondent
Anthony PenalozaPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information