judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ANDERSEN (BRANDON) VS. STATE

Case Information: 34911
Short Caption:ANDERSEN (BRANDON) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7507Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
10/01/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
10/01/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 99-09454
10/08/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. August 30, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Polly C. Stipke. 99-09753
10/29/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 99-10625
10/29/1999AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 99-10626
11/15/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 99-11285
12/27/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-13207
01/25/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-01157
01/25/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/31/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 27, 2000. 00-01157