judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2559
B-2559
02/10/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ZALE CORPORATION
E.I. DUPONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
04/29/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
03/04/1971Reply to ResponsePetitioner
02/18/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
02/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
04/29/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
04/28/1971Response to Motion filed
03/04/1971Reply to Response
02/18/1971Response to Petition
02/10/1971Document received (See Remarks)
02/10/1971Application for Writ of Error - Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E.I. Dupont De Nemours and CompanyRespondent
Zale CorporationPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information