judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ALEXANDER (DAVID LEE) VS. STATE

Case Information: 36374
Short Caption:ALEXANDER (DAVID LEE) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C53624Classification:Criminal Appeal - Other - Other/Proper Person
Disqualifications:RoseCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Justice Maupin for Justice RosePanel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:11/27/2000How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000OtherDisqualification of Justice Rose. Sat in district court proceedings.
07/05/2000Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11364
08/04/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Records due: 120 days. fn1[The records shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 36313, 36332, 36336, 36338, 36343, 36374, 36396. Document No. 00-13561.
11/27/2000Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. Mailed on: 11/22/00. 00-20617
11/27/2000Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
12/13/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "We ORDER this appeal dismissed." NNP02 - WM/MS/NB. 01-20946
01/08/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 02-00251
01/08/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/25/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 11, 2002. 02-00251