judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0061)
Case Number:S-09-0061Case Docketed On:03/26/2009
Linked To: S-09-0209 , S-10-0001
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:AUBREY LASHAWN LAWSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantAubrey Lashawn LawsonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Jenny Lynn Craig

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure, Criminal Law -Prosecutorial Misconduct, Trial - Post-trial Motions
Opinion Number:2010 WY 145
Citation:242 P.3d 993 (Wyo. 2010)

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/05/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/05/2009Motion - Extension of time - brief - appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/06/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/15/2009Motion - Remand to district courtMotionRemand to district courtFinal
06/15/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Remand (Received copy of Motion for New Trial filed in District Court)EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/23/2009Order - Denying Motion for RemandOrderDenyFinal
06/25/2009Motion - Stay briefing - unopposedMotionStay briefing - unopposedFinal
06/25/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Appellants motion to stay briefing schedule; and received copy of proposed order.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/29/2009Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/07/2009Order - Stay briefing ScheduleOrderStay briefingFinal
07/24/2009Rulings-Other Courts/Agencies - Other - Order denying defendant's motion for new trial from District Court.Rulings-Other Courts/AgenciesOtherFinal
08/24/2009Event - Phone Call to counsel for Appellant re stay. Hearing was held and second notice of appeal filed, rehearing held, awaiting notification from the Clerk of the District CourtEventPhone CallFinal
09/30/2009Event - Phone Call - re status of case. DA inadvertently failed to present written order to District Judge. Order has been submitted for approval.EventPhone CallFinal
10/15/2009Event - Phone Call to Public Defender's Office re Order, have not received a signed copy of order.EventPhone CallFinal
10/16/2009Event - Phone Call from Public Defender's Office. In following up status of pending order discovered that an order had been signed on 09/30/09, but was not forwarded to Appellant's counsel. Copy of order faxed to Court.EventPhone CallFinal
10/21/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter (Briefing resumed in S-09-0061)Notice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/27/2009Order - Stay briefing (pending docketing of third Notice of Appeal)OrderStay briefingFinal
01/04/2010Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter, resumes briefing in stayed casesNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
02/22/2010Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/22/2010Event - Hardcopy received - brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/07/2010Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
04/08/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/26/2010Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
05/07/2010Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
05/10/2010Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, six volumes. Volumes I-II, Original Papers; Volume III, Jury Instructions & Verdict; Volume IV, Transcripts; Volume V, Exhibits; Volume VI, Confidential Folder.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
05/10/2010Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
05/11/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Eric Alden for appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/12/2010Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Jenny Craig for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
06/15/2010Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Eric M. Alden, Senior Assistant Appellate Counsel for appellant; Jenny Lynn Craig, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
06/15/2010Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
11/09/2010Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Kite writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
11/23/2010Petition - RehearingPetitionRehearingFinal
11/23/2010Brief - In Support of Petition for RehearingBriefIn Support of Petition for RehearingFinal
11/23/2010Event - Hardcopy received - Petition for Rehearing and Brief of Appellant on Petition for RehearingEventHardcopy receivedFinal
12/14/2010Order - Petition for rehearing - denyOrderPetition for rehearing - denyFinal
12/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/14/2010Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/14/2010Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/14/2010Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
12/16/2010Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 12/15/2010.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal