judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MIRSA HERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1581
Short Caption:MIRSA HERNANDEZ V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Assault Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:DVM2147-10Filed Date:12/15/2010

Opening Event Date:12/15/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:02/09/2011Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:08/31/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantMirsa Hernandez Y
Sandi S. Rhee YN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Adam B. Schwartz NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/15/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/03/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Sandi Rhee, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (By: JAC)
01/03/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Sandi Rhee, Esquire
02/09/2011 On consideration of this court's order of January 3, 2011, directing counsel for appellant to file the statement regarding transcript within 30 days and it appearing that the statement regarding transcript has not been filed, it is ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall within 15 days from the date of this order submit the statement regarding transcript, accompanied by a motion for leave to file out of time. The motion should set forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the document or to request an extension of time within which to do so. (Castillo)
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (68pgs/Tape) 12/8/10 proc.
02/09/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (40pgs/Tape) 12/10/10 proc. w/CD
02/09/2011MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCRIPT no oppo
02/09/2011RECEIVED- aplt's statement regarding transcripts
02/09/2011RECORD COMPLETED
02/16/2011RECORD COPIES
02/16/2011RECORD INDEX
02/22/2011ORD GR MOT FOR LV TO FILE STATEMENT RE TRANSCIPT and the lodged statement regarding transcript is filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (By: JAC)
02/22/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S)
04/12/2011 error
04/13/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF (no oppo)
04/13/2011RECEIVED - aplt's brief
04/13/2011RECEIVED - aplt's appdx
04/18/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for leave to late file the lodged brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that appellant's motion is granted and the lodged brief and limited appendix are filed. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the brief of appellee_ shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. (By: JAC)
04/18/2011APPELLANT'S BRIEF
04/18/2011APPENDIX
05/17/2011APPELLEE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
05/20/2011TMC - MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
07/29/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
07/29/2011FiledAffirmed (Order) (Blackburne-Rigsby and Thompson, Associate Judges, and Terry, Senior Judge)
08/31/2011FiledMandate