judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ESCOTO VS. SIERRA READY MIX

Case Information: 36373
Short Caption:ESCOTO VS. SIERRA READY MIXCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A392951Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/17/2000 / Buchanan, WilliamSP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/05/2000Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Lillian J. Sondgeroth--check no. 21907.
07/05/2000Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 00-11358
07/05/2000Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/17/2000Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William F. Buchanan. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts and docketing statement suspended pending further order of this court.)
08/17/2000Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: August 29, 2000. 00-14377
09/05/2000MotionFiled Motion. 00-15611
11/30/2000Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On September 5, 2000, attorney Lillian J. Sondgeroth, counsel of record for appellants, file a notice of withdrawal. fn1[We note that Lydia Escoto is not a party to this appeal. The June 28, 2000 notice of appeal was filed on behalf of Mark A. Escoto and Ace Concrete, Inc. only. In the event Lydia Escoto believes that she should be a party to this appeal, she should file an appropriate motion.] The proper procedure for withdrawing as counsel is to file a motion to withdraw. We disapprove Sondgeroth's notice of withdrawal as counsel. Sondgeroth shall have 10 days from the date of this order to file the case appeal statement with the district court clerk's office and to file two certified copies of the case appeal statement with the clerk of this court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this appeal as abandoned. 00-20893
02/09/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Attorney's Second Response to Order of November 30, 2000. 01-02699
07/13/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We elect to treat Ms. Sondgeroth's response to our November 30, 2000 order as a motion to withdraw as counsel for Escoto, and we grant the motion. Ms. Sondgeroth shall have 10 days from the date of this order to serve a copy of this order on appellant Escoto and file proof of such service with this court. Because we cannot determine whether Ms. Sondgeroth intends to remain as counsel for appellant Ace Concrete, Inc., Ms. Sondgeroth shall have 10 days from the date of this order to either file a motion to withdraw as counsel for Ace Concrete or a notice of confirmation as counsel for Ace Concrete. Appellant Escoto shall have 60 days from the date of this order to either obtain new counsel and cause new counsel to file a notice of appearance with this court in writing that he does not intend to retain new counsel. New counsel, if obtained, will be expected to participate in the settlement conference program to which this appeal is assigned. 01-11892
08/23/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Michael Bohn as attorney of record in place and stead of Lillian J. Sondergroth as counsel for appellants. 01-14315
08/27/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. William F. Buchanan.
09/28/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. 01-16364
10/09/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK 01-16909
10/09/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.