judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

SHANE CODY WALLACE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-09-0060)
Case Number:S-09-0060Case Docketed On:03/26/2009
Status:Closed
Original Court:Sixth Judicial District Campbell CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:SHANE CODY WALLACE v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:SHANE CODY WALLACE, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantShane Cody WallaceDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingBruce A. Salzburg
Terry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Graham Macdonald Smith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop
Opinion Number:2009 WY 152
Citation:221 P.3d 967

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
03/26/2009Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
03/26/2009Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/13/2009Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
05/13/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/18/2009Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
06/19/2009Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/29/2009Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
06/30/2009Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
07/07/2009Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
07/10/2009Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
07/13/2009Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Confidential Folder; Volume III, Transcripts; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
07/13/2009Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/01/2009Event - Expedited AssignmentEventBrief Only AssignmentFinal
12/14/2009Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Hill writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
12/30/2009Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
12/30/2009Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
12/30/2009Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/05/2010Service - Certified mail signature return cardServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal