judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-2598
B-2598
03/04/1971
Application for Writ of Error
ABBOTT LABORATORIES, ET AL., PARKE-DAVIS AND COMPANY, ET AL., WINTHROP LABORATORIES AND STERLING DRUG, INC.
C. K. GRAVES, JR., ET UX.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/04/1971Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/26/1971Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
03/23/1971Response to PetitionRespondent
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/30/1971Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
08/04/1971Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/21/1971Opinion issued
05/26/1971Supplemental Brief filed
05/12/1971Document received (See Remarks)
03/23/1971Response to Petition
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/04/1971Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
03/04/1971Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Parke-Davis and Company, et al.Petitioner
Abbott Laboratories, et al.Petitioner
C. K. Graves, Jr., et ux.Respondent
Winthrop Laboratories and Sterling Drug, Inc.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information