judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: B-4346
B-4346
12/14/1973
Application for Writ of Error
GENERAL SCREW PRODUCTS CO.
E. G. RICKETTS AND STAR CORP.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/11/1974Motion for RehearingPetitioner
07/11/1974Motion for RehearingRespondent
01/09/1974Response to PetitionPetitioner
12/21/1973Response to PetitionRespondent
12/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledRespondent
12/14/1973Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/11/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
07/11/1974Motion for RehearingOverruled
01/09/1974Response to Petition
12/21/1973Response to Petition
12/19/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/14/1973Application for Writ of Error - Filed
12/14/1973Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
E. G. Ricketts and Star Corp.Respondent
General Screw Products Co.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information