judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

DAVID YOUNG V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CF-1632
Short Caption:DAVID YOUNG V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CF2-1214-10Filed Date:12/30/2010

Opening Event Date:12/30/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:03/23/2012
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantDavid YoungY
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Peter C. LallasNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
12/30/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
01/19/2011 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that Regina Michaels, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. (JAC)
01/19/2011APPOINTING COUNSEL/COURT ORDER REFERRAL (CJA) Regina Michaels, Esquire
02/17/2011STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (RT ordered/needed (pii))
02/17/2011RECEIVED - motion for appeal transcript (attached to statement regarding transcript)
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (103 pgs/tape) 10/13/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (56 pgs/Armstrong) 10/14/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #3 (147 pgs/Van Bremen) 10/18/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #4 (99 pgs/Van Bremen) 10/19/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #5 (14 pgs/Van Bremen) 10/20/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #6 (6 pgs/Armstrong) 10/21/10 proc.
04/12/2011SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #7 (8 pgs/tape) 12/16/10 proc. w/cd
04/20/2011RECORD INDEX
04/20/2011RECORD COPIES
04/25/2011 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
06/03/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until August 31, 2011 (unopposed)
06/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 31, 2011. (JAC)
08/30/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Brief until November 4, 2011 (Appellant)
09/09/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion for extension of time to 11/4/11.
11/04/2011FiledBrief (Appellant)
11/04/2011FiledAppendix (Appellant)
12/05/2011FiledMotion For Summary Affirmance (Appellee)Granted
12/06/2011FiledTMC/MOTION FOR SUMMARY AFFIRMANCE
02/29/2012FiledGRANT - Order Granting Motion for Summary Affirmance
02/29/2012FiledAffirmed
03/23/2012FiledMandate
04/17/2012FiledQualls Letter Filed (Appellant)