judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

MARSHALL LOUIS WASHINGTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-11-0041)
Case Number:S-11-0041Case Docketed On:02/16/2011
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:MARSHALL LOUIS WASHINGTON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:MARSHALL LOUIS WASHINGTON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantMarshall Louis WashingtonDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Eric M. Alden
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Justin A. Daraie
Gregory A. Phillips

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Procedure
Opinion Number:2011 WY 132
Citation:261 P.3d 747

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
02/16/2011Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
02/16/2011Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/05/2011Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
04/05/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.EventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/19/2011Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
05/20/2011Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and Designation of Record on AppealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/27/2011Notice-Internal - Expedite recommendationNotice-InternalBrief only recommendationFinal
06/07/2011Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal from District Court ClerkNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
06/08/2011Order - Assigning to expedited docketOrderAssigning to brief only docketFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
06/13/2011Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Folder; Volume IV, Exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
06/13/2011Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
09/20/2011Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with remand, Justice Voigt writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
10/06/2011Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
10/06/2011Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
10/06/2011Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
10/11/2011Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 10/7/2011.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal